KUŞADASISPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 28.02.1997 | 23.09.1997 | 23.09.1997 |
ADANA DEMİRSPOR A.Ş.
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 05.07.1996 | 19.09.1996 | 19.09.1996 |
KAYSERİ ERCİYESSPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 28.07.1995 | 25.10.1995 | 25.10.1995 |
KAYSERİ ERCİYESSPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 24.11.1994 | 31.05.1995 | |
BURSASPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 05.07.1994 | 24.11.1994 | 24.11.1994 |
BURSASPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 23.11.1993 | 31.05.1994 | |
AYDINSPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 13.08.1993 | 22.11.1993 | 22.11.1993 |
SARIYER
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 27.08.1992 | 31.05.1993 | |
KAYSERİ ERCİYESSPOR
| PROFESSIONAL TEAM HEAD COACH | 19.06.1991 | 31.05.1992 | |